|
10/19/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
10/19/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5242.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file. Read third time. Amended. (Page 7121.) To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 7126.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 888.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 636.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|