LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB209
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB209
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB209
Compare Versions
SB209 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB209 Enrolled August 18, 2009
SB209 Amended July 2, 2009
SB209 Amended June 3, 2009
SB209 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB209 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB209 Enrolled August 18, 2009
SB209 Amended July 2, 2009
SB209 Amended June 3, 2009
SB209 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare