|
09/29/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4907.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6533.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6372.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6323.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 2730.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2693.)
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 340.)
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|