|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1169.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 729.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 608.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|