02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/16/2009 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/13/2009 | Set for hearing April 22. | |||
04/08/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/26/2009 | Set for hearing April 15. | |||
03/24/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/12/2009 | Set for hearing April 1. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/24/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/23/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |