California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB217 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 05/06/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 217AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 20, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senators Yee and Romero (Coauthors: Senators DeSaulnier and Denham) FEBRUARY 23, 2009 An act to add  Sections 71090.3 and   Section  89500.5 to, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 92010) to Chapter 1 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 217, as amended, Yee. Public postsecondary education: executive officer compensation. Existing law establishes the University of California, which is administered by the Regents of the University of California, the California State University, which is administered by the Trustees of the California State University, and the California Community Colleges, which is administered by the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as the 3 segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law authorizes the regents, the trustees, and the board to employ officers and other employees. This bill would prohibit the trustees  and the board  from increasing the monetary compensation, as defined, of, or approving a monetary bonus for, any executive officer, as defined, of  their respective segments   the California State University  in any fiscal year in which the General Fund appropriation to the  respective segment   California State University  in the annual Budget Act is less than, or equal to, the General Fund appropriation to  that segment   the university  in the annual Budget Act for the immediately preceding fiscal year. The bill would request the regents to not increase the monetary compensation of, or approve a monetary bonus for, any executive officer, as defined, of the University of California, in any fiscal year in which the General Fund appropriation to the University of California in the annual Budget Act is less than, or equal to, the General Fund appropriation to the university in the annual Budget Act for the immediately preceding fiscal year. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 71090.3 is added to the Education Code, to read: 71090.3. (a) The board of governors shall not increase the monetary compensation of, or approve payment of a monetary bonus to, any executive officer in any fiscal year in which the amount of General Fund moneys appropriated to the California Community Colleges in the annual Budget Act is less than, or equal to, the amount of the General Fund moneys appropriated to the California Community Colleges in the annual Budget Act for the immediately preceding fiscal year. (b) As used in this section, the following terms have the following meanings: (1) "Executive officer" includes, but is not limited to, the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges, an executive vice chancellor, a senior vice chancellor, the general counsel of the colleges. (2) "Monetary compensation" includes, but is not limited to, a salary, a vehicle allowance, and a housing allowance. (c) Subdivision (a) shall apply only to executive officers that enter into or renew a contract for employment with the California Community Colleges on or after January 1, 2010.   SEC. 2.   SECTION 1.  Section 89500.5 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89500.5. (a) The trustees shall not increase the monetary compensation of, or approve payment of a monetary bonus to, any executive officer in any fiscal year in which the amount of General Fund moneys appropriated to the California State University in the annual Budget Act is less than, or equal to, the amount of General Fund moneys appropriated to the California State University in the annual Budget Act for the immediately preceding fiscal year. (b) As used in this section, the following terms have the following meanings: (1) "Executive officer" includes, but is not limited to, the Chancellor of the California State University, a vice chancellor of the university, an executive vice chancellor of the university, the general counsel of the university, the trustees' secretary, a president of a campus, and a managerial employee as defined in Section 3562 of the Government Code. (2) "Monetary compensation" includes, but is not limited to, a salary, a vehicle allowance, and a housing allowance. (c) Subdivision (a) shall apply only to executive officers that enter into or renew a contract for employment with the California State University on or after January 1, 2010.  SEC. 3.   SEC. 2.  Article 2 (commencing with Section 92010) is added to Chapter 1 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of the Education Code, to read: Article 2. Executive Compensation 92010. (a) The Regents of the University of California are requested to not increase the monetary compensation of, or approve payment of a monetary bonus to, any executive officer in any fiscal year in which the amount of General Fund moneys appropriated to the University of California in the annual Budget Act is less than, or equal to, the amount of General Fund moneys appropriated to the University of California in the immediately preceding fiscal year. (b) As used in this section, the following terms have the following meanings: (1) "Executive officer" includes, but is not limited to, the President of the University of California, the chancellor of an individual campus, a vice president of the university, the treasurer of the university, the assistant treasurer of the university, the general counsel of the university, the regents' secretary  ,  and a managerial employee as defined in Section 3562 of the Government Code. (2) "Monetary compensation" includes, but is not limited to, a salary, a vehicle allowance, and a housing allowance. (c) Subdivision (a) shall apply only to executive officers that enter into or renew a contract for employment with the University of California on or after January 1, 2010.