LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB218
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB218
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB218
Compare Versions
SB218 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB218 Amended September 2, 2009
SB218 Amended August 26, 2009
SB218 Amended August 17, 2009
SB218 Amended July 14, 2009
SB218 Amended June 30, 2009
SB218 Amended May 28, 2009
SB218 Amended May 20, 2009
SB218 Amended May 5, 2009
SB218 Amended April 27, 2009
SB218 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB218 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB218 Amended September 2, 2009
SB218 Amended August 26, 2009
SB218 Amended August 17, 2009
SB218 Amended July 14, 2009
SB218 Amended June 30, 2009
SB218 Amended May 28, 2009
SB218 Amended May 20, 2009
SB218 Amended May 5, 2009
SB218 Amended April 27, 2009
SB218 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare