|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 1908.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 2480.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1008.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 15. Page 927.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Yee. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 927.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 808.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 2.)
|
|
|