08/13/2010 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
08/05/2010 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |||
02/04/2010 | To Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
01/25/2010 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
01/25/2010 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2706.) To Assembly. | |||
01/20/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
01/19/2010 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
01/05/2010 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
12/18/2009 | Set for hearing January 4. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on EQ. | |||
12/02/2008 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | |||
12/01/2008 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |