California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB221 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/06/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 221CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 39 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 6, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 5, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 23, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Walters FEBRUARY 23, 2009 An act to amend Section 1247.9 of the Business and Professions Code, and to repeal Chapter 11 (commencing with Section 1794.01) of Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to home dialysis agencies. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 221, Walters. Home dialysis agencies. Existing law provides for the licensing and regulation of home dialysis agencies by the State Department of Public Health. This bill would repeal these provisions and make a conforming change. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares that the provisions of Chapter 11 (commencing with Section 1794.01) of Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code relating to home dialysis agencies have never been implemented, and will not be implemented due to existing funding constraints. Allowing these provisions to remain in the code has created confusion and misunderstandings with respect to dialysis services provided in skilled nursing facilities. It is necessary to repeal these provisions to avoid continued confusion and misunderstandings. SEC. 2. Section 1247.9 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 1247.9. No person or entity shall provide chronic dialysis services to patients in this state unless the services are provided under the direction of a chronic dialysis clinic, licensed pursuant to Section 1204 of the Health and Safety Code, or a general acute care hospital, licensed pursuant to Section 1250 of the Health and Safety Code. SEC. 3. Chapter 11 (commencing with Section 1794.01) of Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code is repealed.