02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/07/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
12/17/2009 | Set for hearing January 13. | |||
04/15/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 22. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Coms. on L. & I.R. and REV. & TAX. | |||
02/24/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/23/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |