|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1841.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2451.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 624.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 398.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|