02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
08/18/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
04/29/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Corrected May 6.) | |||
04/22/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/16/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Coms. on EQ. and RLS. | |||
02/24/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/23/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |