|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1765.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2315.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 625.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 588.)
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|