|
09/28/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 406, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4920.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 6496.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6352.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6333.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2731.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2693.)
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 754.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|