|
02/01/2010
|
Conference Committee Report placed on inactive file by Assembly Member Torrico
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Conference Committee Report stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
From Conference Committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8: Senators Steinberg, Florez, Padilla, and Pavley, Assembly Members Bass, Huffman, Caballero, and Solorio. Noes. 0. Page 2351.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Senate appoints Conference Committee: Senators Steinberg, Aanestad, Cogdill, Florez, Huff, Padilla, and Pavley. Assembly appoints Conference Committee: Assembly Members Bass, Caballero, Fuller, Huffman, Jeffries, Nielsen, and Solorio.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29.5 suspended in the Senate. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 2005.) Joint Rules 28, 28.1, 29, and 29.5 suspended in the Assembly. (Ayes 58. Noes 0. Page 2827.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 0. Noes 36. Page 1756.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 2489.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 2433.) Placed on second reading file. Read second time. Amended. To third reading. (Ayes 43. Noes 26. Page 2441.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1191.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1069.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 478.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|