California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB23 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2008

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill July 9, 2009
Bill June 29, 2009
Bill May 28, 2009
Bill April 30, 2009
Bill April 21, 2009