|
08/31/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 17. Page 1005.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 848.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 678.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|