LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB232
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB232
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB232
Action History
02/01/2010
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
04/01/2009
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/25/2009
Set for hearing April 14.
03/09/2009
To Com. on T. & H.
02/24/2009
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
02/23/2009
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.