02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/21/2009 | Set for hearing April 29. | |||
04/13/2009 | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/25/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |