|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3328.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 885.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 655.)
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 498.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|