|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 2117.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2671.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 507.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 383.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|