BILL NUMBER: SB 247AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 15, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 16, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 11, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Alquist (Principal coauthor: Senator Romero) ( Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Torlakson ) (Coauthors: Senators Maldonado and Padilla) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Blumenfield and Solorio Blumenfield, Brownley, and Solorio ) FEBRUARY 24, 2009 An act to amend Section 60422 of the Education Code, relating to electronic instructional materials. An act to add Section 60422.1 to the Education Code, relating to instructional materials. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 247, as amended, Alquist. Electronic instructional Instructional materials. Existing law, the Instructional Materials Funding Realignment Program, provides for funds to be apportioned to school districts based upon enrollment to ensure that each pupil is provided with a standards-aligned textbook or basic instructional materials, as adopted by the State Board of Education subsequent to the adoption of content standards, or as adopted by the local governing board, for grades 9 to 12, inclusive. This bill would provide that a local governing board may use funding received pursuant to these provisions to purchase state-adopted instructional materials for kindergarten and grades 1 to 8, inclusive, and state standards-aligned materials for grades 9 to 12, inclusive, in an electronic or hardbound format if it can ensure that each pupil will be provided with a copy of the instructional materials to use at school and at home. However, providing access to the materials at school and at home would not require the local educational agency to purchase 2 sets of materials . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60422.1 is added to the Education Code , to read: 60422.1. Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a local governing board may use funding received pursuant to this chapter to purchase state-adopted instructional materials for kindergarten and grades 1 to 8, inclusive, and state standards-aligned materials for grades 9 to 12, inclusive, in an electronic or hardbound format if it can ensure that each pupil will be provided with a copy of the instructional materials to use at school and at home. However, providing access to the materials at school and at home does not require the local educational agency to purchase two sets of materials. SECTION 1. Section 60422 of the Education Code is amended to read: 60422. (a) A local governing board shall use funding received pursuant to this chapter to ensure that each pupil is provided with a standards-aligned textbook or basic instructional materials, as adopted by the State Board of Education subsequent to the adoption of content standards pursuant to Section 60605 for kindergarten and grades 1 to 8, inclusive, or as adopted by the local governing board pursuant to Sections 60400 and 60411, for grades 9 to 12, inclusive. Pupils shall be provided with standards-aligned textbooks or basic instructional materials by the beginning of the first school term that commences no later than 24 months after those materials were adopted by the State Board of Education. (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a local governing board may use funding received pursuant to this chapter to purchase state-adopted instructional materials for kindergarten and grades 1 to 8, inclusive, and state standards-aligned materials for grades 9 to 12, inclusive, in an electronic or hardbound format. (c) Once a governing board certifies compliance with subdivision (a) with regard to standards-aligned instructional materials in the core curriculum areas of reading/language arts, mathematics, science, and history/social sciences, and if the governing board of a school district has met the eligibility requirements of Section 60119, the remaining funds may only be used consistent with subdivision (a) of Section 60242 and pursuant to Section 60242.5. (d) The State Board of Education may grant the school district additional time to meet the purchasing requirements of subdivision (a) if the governing board of the school district demonstrates, to the satisfaction of the state board, that all of the following criteria apply to the district: (1) The school district has implemented a well-designed, standards-aligned basic instructional materials program. (2) The school district, at the time of its request for additional time pursuant to this subdivision, has sufficient textbooks or basic instructional materials for use by each pupil. (3) The school district has adopted a plan for the purchase of standards-aligned instructional materials in accordance with subdivision (a) but that plan indicated an alternative date for compliance that is declared in the request for additional time. (e) The funds provided for the purchase of instructional materials in Schedules 1 and 2 of Item 6110-189-0001 and paragraph 6 of Item 6110-485 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2002 shall be used for the purposes of, and allocated consistent with, this chapter.