LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB247
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB247
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB247
Compare Versions
SB247 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB247 Enrolled August 25, 2009
SB247 Amended July 15, 2009
SB247 Amended June 16, 2009
SB247 Amended June 11, 2009
SB247 Amended May 6, 2009
SB247 Amended April 14, 2009
SB247 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB247 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB247 Enrolled August 25, 2009
SB247 Amended July 15, 2009
SB247 Amended June 16, 2009
SB247 Amended June 11, 2009
SB247 Amended May 6, 2009
SB247 Amended April 14, 2009
SB247 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare