BILL NUMBER: SB 247CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 209 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 24, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 15, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 16, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 11, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Alquist (Principal coauthor: Senator Romero) (Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Torlakson) (Coauthors: Senators Maldonado and Padilla) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Blumenfield, Brownley, and Solorio) FEBRUARY 24, 2009 An act to add Section 60422.1 to the Education Code, relating to instructional materials. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 247, Alquist. Instructional materials. Existing law, the Instructional Materials Funding Realignment Program, provides for funds to be apportioned to school districts based upon enrollment to ensure that each pupil is provided with a standards-aligned textbook or basic instructional materials, as adopted by the State Board of Education subsequent to the adoption of content standards, or as adopted by the local governing board, for grades 9 to 12, inclusive. This bill would provide that a local governing board may use funding received pursuant to these provisions to purchase state-adopted instructional materials for kindergarten and grades 1 to 8, inclusive, and state standards-aligned materials for grades 9 to 12, inclusive, in an electronic or hardbound format if it can ensure that each pupil will be provided with a copy of the instructional materials to use at school and at home. However, providing access to the materials at school and at home would not require the local educational agency to purchase 2 sets of materials. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60422.1 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60422.1. Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a local governing board may use funding received pursuant to this chapter to purchase state-adopted instructional materials for kindergarten and grades 1 to 8, inclusive, and state standards-aligned materials for grades 9 to 12, inclusive, in an electronic or hardbound format if it can ensure that each pupil will be provided with a copy of the instructional materials to use at school and at home. However, providing access to the materials at school and at home does not require the local educational agency to purchase two sets of materials.