California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB249 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 20, 2009
Bill April 27, 2009