|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 632, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2372.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3058.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2711.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Ordered returned to Assembly for further action.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2544.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 8.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 622.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 499.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|