02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
04/27/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 397.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/19/2009 | Set for hearing April 1. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on ED. | |||
02/25/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |