|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Re-referred to Com. On RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6428.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Evans.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Block.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 796.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 608.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|