08/06/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 42, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/05/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/27/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
07/13/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/13/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2482.) To Senate. | |||
07/02/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.) | |||
06/08/2009 | To Coms. on G.O. and JUD. | |||
05/26/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/26/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1004.) To Assembly. | |||
05/20/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/19/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 874.) | |||
04/30/2009 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 680.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
02/25/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |