LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB256
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB256
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB256
Compare Versions
SB256 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB256 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB256 Amended July 23, 2009
SB256 Amended May 21, 2009
SB256 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB256 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB256 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB256 Amended July 23, 2009
SB256 Amended May 21, 2009
SB256 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare