|
08/13/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1106.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 848.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 675.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|