|
08/27/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Corrected July 2.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1189.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1069.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 683.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|