|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2214.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 2712.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 18. Page 1010.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 850.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|