California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB262 Amended / Bill

Filed 07/13/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 262AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 13, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 11, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 13, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 11, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Lowenthal FEBRUARY 24, 2009 An act to amend Section 30315 of, and to add Section 30315.2 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 262, as amended, Lowenthal. Coastal resources: California Coastal Commission: meeting. Existing law requires the California Coastal Commission to meet at least once a month at a place convenient to the public. This bill would, instead, require the commission to meet at least 10 times per year. This bill would  require the commission to provide a minimum of 10 days' public notice prior to canceling a meeting and would require the commission to consider cancellation of a meeting at a public hearing to allow for public comment. The bill would  provide that  if the commission cancels a meeting pursuant to this provision,  a deadline for a commission hearing or action established pursuant to the California Coastal Act of 1976, the California Environmental Quality Act, or the Permit Streamlining Act is extended until the adjournment of the next regularly scheduled commission meeting after the deadline. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 30315 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 30315. (a) The commission shall meet at least 10 times per year at a place convenient to the public. All meetings of the commission shall be open to the public. (b) A majority of the total appointed membership of the commission shall constitute a quorum. An action taken by the commission under this division requires a majority vote of the members present at the meeting of the commission, with a quorum being present, unless otherwise specifically provided for in this division.  (c) The commission shall provide a minimum of 10 days' public notice prior to canceling a meeting. Any action to cancel a meeting shall be considered at a public hearing to allow for public comment.  SEC. 2. Section 30315.2 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 30315.2. Notwithstanding any other law,  if the commission cancels a meeting pursuant to subdivision (c) of Section 30315,  a deadline for a commission hearing or action established pursuant to this division, the California Environmental Quality Act (Division 13 (commencing with Section 21000)), or the Permit Streamlining Act (Article 5 (commencing with Section 65950) of Chapter 4.5 of Division 1 of Title 7 of the Government Code), is hereby extended until the adjournment of the next regularly scheduled commission meeting after the deadline. This section does not apply to actions that the executive director may take without the approval or concurrence of the commission.