02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/28/2009 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 704.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/01/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
03/31/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/25/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |