|
06/22/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Heard in committee on June 10.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1192.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 16. Page 1114.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Harman. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1114.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 729.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|