06/05/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2009. | |||
06/05/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
06/02/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m. | |||
05/28/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
05/28/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 1757.) To Senate. | |||
05/18/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/14/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on May 13.) | |||
04/30/2009 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |||
03/12/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
03/12/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 285.) To Assembly. | |||
03/04/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 254.) | |||
02/23/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
02/09/2009 | Set for hearing March 4. | |||
12/03/2008 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 2. | |||
12/02/2008 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |