|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 501, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4947.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6358.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (June 28 amended version corrected June 28.)
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2704.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2672.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/08/2010
|
Set for hearing January 13.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 729.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|