|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1909.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 2607.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2539.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 648.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 608.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|