LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB273
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB273
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB273
Compare Versions
SB273 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB273 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB273 Amended August 17, 2009
SB273 Amended July 7, 2009
SB273 Amended June 22, 2009
SB273 Amended May 26, 2009
SB273 Amended May 5, 2009
SB273 Amended March 31, 2009
SB273 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB273 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB273 Enrolled September 4, 2009
SB273 Amended August 17, 2009
SB273 Amended July 7, 2009
SB273 Amended June 22, 2009
SB273 Amended May 26, 2009
SB273 Amended May 5, 2009
SB273 Amended March 31, 2009
SB273 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare