01/21/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/11/2010 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 0. Page 2648.) | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
12/11/2009 | Set for hearing January 11. | |||
04/21/2009 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 580.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
02/25/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |