|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 8. Page 2332.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2850.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 648.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 498.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|