02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/13/2010 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 2665.) | |||
12/17/2009 | Set for hearing January 12. | |||
03/31/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | |||
03/17/2009 | Set for hearing March 31. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
12/03/2008 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 2. | |||
12/02/2008 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |