02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/18/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/07/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/05/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/01/2009 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 684.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
04/22/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/26/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
03/23/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/16/2009 | Set for hearing April 1. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on ED. | |||
02/25/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |