02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/28/2009 | Set, second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/09/2009 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
02/25/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |