|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6428.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6335.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6297.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 892.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 704.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 588.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|