BILL NUMBER: SB 283CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 178 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 2, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 12, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 4, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 31, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator DeSaulnier FEBRUARY 24, 2009 An act to amend Section 13557 of the Water Code, relating to recycled water, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 283, DeSaulnier. Department of Water Resources: recycled water systems. Existing law, the Water Recycling Act of 2006, requires the Department of Water Resources, in consultation with the State Department of Health Services, on or before July 1, 2008, to adopt and submit to the California Building Standards Commission regulations to establish a state version of Appendix J of the Uniform Plumbing Code to provide design standards to safely plumb buildings with both potable and recycled water systems. This bill would revise the date the Department of Water Resources is required to adopt and submit regulations, as specified, to the commission to December 31, 2009. The bill would, commencing July 1, 2011, and annually thereafter, require the department to review and update, as necessary, the regulations. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13557 of the Water Code is amended to read: 13557. (a) On or before December 31, 2009, the department, in consultation with the State Department of Public Health, shall adopt and submit to the California Building Standards Commission regulations to establish a state version of Chapter 16 of the Uniform Plumbing Code adopted by the International Association of Plumbing and Mechanical Officials to provide design standards to safely plumb buildings with both potable and recycled water systems. (b) Commencing July 1, 2011, and annually thereafter, the department shall review and update, as necessary, the regulations developed pursuant to subdivision (a). (c) This section shall be exempt from the provisions of Section 161. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to address the current water shortage and permit indoor recycled water use, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.