LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB285
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB285
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB285
Compare Versions
SB285 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB285 Enrolled September 2, 2009
SB285 Amended August 17, 2009
SB285 Amended July 1, 2009
SB285 Amended April 22, 2009
SB285 Amended April 2, 2009
SB285 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB285 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB285 Enrolled September 2, 2009
SB285 Amended August 17, 2009
SB285 Amended July 1, 2009
SB285 Amended April 22, 2009
SB285 Amended April 2, 2009
SB285 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare