|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 5005.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 3. Page 6799.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6624.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6256.) To third reading. Re-referred to Com. On HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 828.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 556.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|